Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Albán Barreiro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1764Born
14 Apr 181753.2AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
22 Nov 181854.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
8 Dec 183773.9DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Albán Barreiro
Bishop Francisco Albán Barreiro O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Berducido, Diocese of Tuy, Spain
Ordained BishopManila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 137, Number 738
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 87
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 100, Number 8,632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Dec 2020

Quantcast