Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Artaraz Emaldi, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Cotenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1873Born
20 May 189926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Jun 193259.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh, Viet Nam
14 Jun 193259.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
6 Nov 193259.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
19 Dec 194774.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Artaraz Emaldi
Bishop Eugenio Artaraz Emaldi O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bac Ninh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYurré, Spain

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast