Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicasio Arellano, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Cucusus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1861Born
19 Sep 187917.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Mar 188523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Apr 190644.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
23 Apr 190644.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
14 Oct 190644.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cucusus
14 Apr 191957.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
5 Jan 192765.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Nicasio Arellano
Bishop Nicasio Arellano O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorella, Spain
Ordained BishopKe Sot

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 62
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast