Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Müller, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1932Born
10 Dec 196129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
25 Apr 198452.1AppointedBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Jun 198452.3Ordained BishopBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Nov 200876.7RetiredBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Mar 201179.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Müller
Bishop Anselmo Müller M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Januária

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSăo Joăo Batista, Cathedral, Santa Cruz do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2008
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast