Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Abeli Muhoya Mutchapa

Bishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1974 Born
6 Jan 200227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
18 Nov 202046.7AppointedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Feb 202146.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François Abeli Muhoya Mutchapa
Bishop François Abeli Muhoya Mutchapa (born ) Bishop of Kindu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKindu, Diocese of Kindu
Ordained BishopStade Makuta, Kindu, Diocese of Kindu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kindu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 6 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 247, Number 20,596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast