Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William James Muhm

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1957 Born
13 May 199537.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
22 Jan 201961.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
22 Jan 201961.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
25 Mar 201961.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus

MicroData Summary for William James Muhm
Bishop William James Muhm (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBillings, MT
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopNational Shrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of United States of America, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2019
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 22 Jan 2019
  • c3+: CB, 15 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast