Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Mogapi Mphiwe

Bishop of Rustenburg, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1972 Born
1 Nov 199725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pretoria, South Africa
25 Nov 202048.6AppointedBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa
27 Feb 202148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rustenburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Robert Mogapi Mphiwe
Bishop Robert Mogapi Mphiwe (born ) Bishop of Rustenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePretoria, Archdiocese of Pretoria
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Church, Tlhabane, Diocese of Rustenburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rustenburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Dec 2020
  • ~ob: AM, 23 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2021
  • c2+: CB, 27 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 247, Number 20,611

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022