Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Michael Moynihan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1932Born
15 Dec 195725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
4 Apr 199562.7AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
29 May 199562.8Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
21 Apr 200976.7RetiredBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
6 Mar 201784.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Michael Moynihan (VIAF: 78343066)
Bishop James Michael Moynihan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochester, Diocese of Rochester, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Death PlaceJamesville, NY, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,561
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 6 Mar 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CB, 31 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast