Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Moreschi, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1952Born
1 Sep 197422.2First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Aug 198028.1Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Oct 198230.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Nov 200048.4AppointedPrefect of Gambella, Ethiopia
25 Feb 200148.6InstalledPrefect of Gambella, Ethiopia
5 Dec 200957.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia
5 Dec 200957.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania
31 Jan 201057.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania
25 Mar 202067.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Angelo Moreschi
Bishop Angelo Moreschi S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gambella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNave, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Paolo, Church, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gambella, Vicariate Apostolic of Gambella
Death PlaceSpedali Civili, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Nave, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,563
  • d: CB, 25 Mar 2020
  • loc/i/c1: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast