Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Mark Gerard Miles

Apostolic Nuncio to Benin

Titular Archbishop of Città Ducale

Apostolic Nuncio to Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1967 Born
14 Sep 199629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gibraltar
5 Feb 202153.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Benin
5 Feb 202153.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Città Ducale
2 Mar 202153.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Togo
25 Apr 202153.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Città Ducale

MicroData Summary for Mark Gerard Miles
Monsignor Mark Gerard Miles (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Benin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Ordained PriestSt. Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Ordained BishopEuropa Point Sports Complex, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

Please contact the Monsignor through the Nunciature to Benin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2021
  • loc: AM, 6 Feb 2021
  • c1: CL, 6 Feb 2021
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast