Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Francisco Miguel António Cardinal de Mendonça Valdereis

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1725Born
5 Oct 175530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
10 Mar 178862.4AppointedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Apr 178862.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 Nov 178863.1Ordained BishopPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
11 Feb 181892.3DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Miguel António de Mendonça Valdereis
José Francisco Miguel António Cardinal de Mendonça Valdereis (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
  • a cardinal for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,080
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Apr 1788
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast