Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Meini

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1946 Born
4 Jul 197023.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Volterra, Italy
27 Jun 197124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
13 Jul 199649.6AppointedBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
7 Sep 199649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
29 Oct 199649.9InstalledBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
13 Feb 201063.2AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
18 Apr 201063.4InstalledBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Meini (VIAF: 120373064)
Bishop Mario Meini (born ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegoli di Peccioli, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained PriestChurch, Legoli di Peccioli, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Assunta, Cathedral, Volterra, Diocese of Volterra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fiesole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,787
  • c01/od/i: AM, 29 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast