Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Meile

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1891Born
24 Mar 191725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
20 Sep 193847.1SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
26 Sep 193847.1ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 Oct 193847.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
6 Jan 195765.4DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Meile
Bishop Joseph Meile (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMosnang

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast