Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Josef Caminada

Deceased

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1876Born
22 Jul 190024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chur, Switzerland
23 Sep 194165.7SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
17 Oct 194165.7ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
23 Nov 194165.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
18 Jan 196286.0DiedBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Christian Josef Caminada (VIAF: 61567916)
Bishop Christian Josef Caminada (born , died ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurrhin
Death PlaceChur, Diocese of Chur

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 61
  • mn/op/c1: CB, 8 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast