Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kevin McNamara

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1926Born
19 Jun 194923.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 197650.1AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
7 Nov 197650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry, Ireland
15 Nov 198458.4AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
8 Apr 198760.8DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Kevin McNamara (VIAF: 92169007)
Archbishop Kevin McNamara (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewmarket-in-Fergus
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, Killarney
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Pro-Cathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast