Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diarmaid (Dermot) O’Súilleabháin (O’Sullivan)

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1924Born
19 Jun 194924.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 198560.3AppointedBishop of Kerry, Ireland
26 May 198560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry, Ireland
27 Aug 199469.7DiedBishop of Kerry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Diarmaid (Dermot) O’Súilleabháin (O’Sullivan)
Bishop Diarmaid (Dermot) O’Súilleabháin (O’Sullivan) (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Killarney

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,735
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast