Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista di Mandello, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1746²Born
14 Feb 179246.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China
14 Feb 179246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
21 Dec 179448.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
25 Jun 180458.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista di Mandello
Bishop Giovanni Battista di Mandello O.F.M. Obs. (born 1746, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMandello, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSzechwan
Death PlaceKiangchow

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 187, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 20
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast