Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bienvenu Manamika Bafouakouahou

Coadjutor Archbishop of Brazzaville, Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1964 Born
29 Aug 199328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kinkala, Congo
24 May 201348.6AppointedBishop of Dolisie, Congo
25 Aug 201348.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dolisie, Congo
18 Apr 202055.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Brazzaville, Congo

MicroData Summary for Bienvenu Manamika Bafouakouahou
Archbishop Bienvenu Manamika Bafouakouahou (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Brazzaville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrazzaville
Ordained BishopStade municipal Denis Sassou Nguesso, Dolisie, Diocese of Dolisie

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brazzaville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 27 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,856
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast