Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Leonhard Maluma

Deceased

Bishop of Njombe, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1955Born
17 Nov 198529.9Ordained PriestPriest of Njombe, Tanzania
8 Jun 200246.4AppointedBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
1 Sep 200246.7Ordained BishopBishop of Njombe, Tanzania
6 Apr 202165.3DiedBishop of Njombe, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Alfred Leonhard Maluma (VIAF: 281322961)
Bishop Alfred Leonhard Maluma (born , died ) Bishop of Njombe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLukani
Ordained BishopNjombe, Diocese of Njombe
Death PlaceMuhimbili National, Hospital, Dar-es-Salaam, Archdiocese of Dar-es-Salaam

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,245
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast