Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Maloney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

Titular Bishop of Andropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1903Born
13 Jul 193027.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 196056.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
2 Jan 196056.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Andropolis
11 May 196057.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andropolis
10 Sep 196259.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Maloney
Bishop Thomas Francis Maloney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 54
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast