Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Patterson Lyke, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1939Born
24 Jun 196627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Jun 197940.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
30 Jun 197940.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
1 Aug 197940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
10 Jul 199051.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
30 Apr 199152.1AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
24 Jun 199152.3InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
27 Dec 199253.8DiedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for James Patterson Lyke
Archbishop James Patterson Lyke O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,043

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast