Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camilo Lorenzo Iglesias

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1940Born
23 Dec 196626.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 199554.8AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
30 Jul 199554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
18 Nov 201575.2RetiredBishop of Astorga, Spain
13 Jul 202079.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Camilo Lorenzo Iglesias
Bishop Camilo Lorenzo Iglesias (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Canda
Ordained BishopCathedral, Astorga, Diocese of Astorga
Death PlacePonferrada

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,600
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015
  • d: CB, 13 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast