Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Paul Logan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1941Born
14 Mar 196422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Jan 198139.5AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Feb 198139.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Jun 201271.0ResignedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
14 Jan 202179.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Vincent Paul Logan
Bishop Vincent Paul Logan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dunkeld

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBathgate, West Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Edinburgh, Lothian, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland
Ordained BishopSt. Andrew, Cathedral, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Death PlaceSt. Mary's Care Home, Monifieth, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)Balgay, Cemetery, Dundee, Tayside, Diocese of Dunkeld, Scotland

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,480
  • d: CB, 14 Jan 2021
  • d.loc: CL, 14 Jan 2021
  • 23.loc: CL, 7 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast