Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Liu Xinhong

Bishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1964² Born
18 Nov 199026.8Ordained PriestPriest
2005²41.0SelectedBishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China
3 May 200642.3Ordained BishopBishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China
22 Sep 201854.7ConfirmedBishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Liu Xinhong
Bishop Joseph Liu Xinhong (born 1964) Bishop of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWuhu

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Anqing [Anking, Huai-ning].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast