Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Liu Cheng-chung

Bishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1951 Born
13 Apr 198029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kiayi, Taiwan
1 Jul 199443.2AppointedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
28 Sep 199443.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
5 Jul 200453.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
5 Jan 200654.7SucceededBishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
21 Nov 200958.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Kaohsiung, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Peter Liu Cheng-chung
Archbishop Peter Liu Cheng-chung (born ) Bishop of Kaohsiung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHushuei
Ordained BishopAuditiorium, lycée Sacré Coeur, Touliu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Kaohsiung.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,440
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast