Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Lê Phong Thuận

Deceased

Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1930Born
31 May 196029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cân Tho, Viet Nam
6 Jun 197544.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
6 Jun 197544.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
6 Jun 197544.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abthugni
20 Jun 199059.5SucceededBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
17 Oct 201079.8DiedBishop of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Lê Phong Thuận
Bishop Emmanuel Lê Phong Thuận (born , died ) Bishop of Cần Thơ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMy Luong
Ordained PriestCathedral, Cần Thơ, Vicariate Apostolic of Cân Tho

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: CB, 3 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast