Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bosco Lin Chi-nan

Bishop Emeritus of Tainan, Taiwan

Apostolic Administrator of Tainan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1943 Born
6 Jan 197329.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 199249.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaohsiung, Taiwan
28 Sep 199249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Alexanum
2 Jan 199349.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alexanum
24 Jan 200460.6AppointedBishop of Tainan, Taiwan
14 Nov 202077.5RetiredBishop of Tainan, Taiwan
19 Jun 202178.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tainan, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Bosco Lin Chi-nan
Bishop Bosco Lin Chi-nan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tainan

EventPlace
Birth PlacePingtung
Ordained BishopWentsao Ursuline Junior College of Modern Languages, Kaohsiung, Diocese of Kaohsiung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tainan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,993
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2020
  • aadm: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast