Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Bautista Layog

Auxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Girus Tarasii

Apostolic Administrator of Alaminos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1968 Born
29 Apr 199627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
18 Mar 201950.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
18 Mar 201950.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
8 May 201950.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
14 Jan 202051.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alaminos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Bautista Layog
Bishop Fidelis Bautista Layog (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDagupan, Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Dagupan City, Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2019
  • mn: CB, 18 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 19 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,147
  • ab: CB, 14 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast