Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nunzio Latino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1937Born
25 May 196325.5Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
2 Mar 197739.3IncardinatedPriest of Houma-Thibodaux, Louisiana, USA
3 Jan 200365.2AppointedBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
7 Mar 200365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
12 Dec 201376.1RetiredBishop of Jackson, Mississippi, USA
28 May 202183.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Jackson, Mississippi, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nunzio Latino
Bishop Joseph Nunzio Latino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jackson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Ordained PriestSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana
Ordained BishopSaint Peter the Apostle, Cathedral, Jackson, Diocese of Jackson, Mississippi
Death PlaceUniversity Medical Center, Jackson, Diocese of Jackson, Mississippi

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,344
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 May 2021

Quantcast