Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonard Pétion Laroche

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hinche, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1918Born
11 Jul 194324.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 198263.5AppointedBishop of Hinche, Haïti
11 Jul 198263.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hinche, Haïti
30 Jun 199879.6RetiredBishop of Hinche, Haïti
14 Jun 200687.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Hinche, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Léonard Pétion Laroche
Bishop Léonard Pétion Laroche (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hinche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Vallée de Jacmel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,229
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast