Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe La Placa

Bishop of Ragusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1962 Born
29 Jun 198623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
8 May 202158.4AppointedBishop of Ragusa, Italy
16 Jul 202158.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ragusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe La Placa
Bishop Giuseppe La Placa (born ) Bishop of Ragusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceResuttano, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni, Cathedral, Ragusa, Diocese of Ragusa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ragusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2021
  • c1: CB, 9 May 2021
  • ob: CB, 17 May 2021
  • c2: CB, 9 Jul 2021
  • c3+: CB, 12 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast