Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Lanzani

Secretary Emeritus of the Fabric of St. Peter

Titular Bishop of Labicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1951 Born
3 Apr 197624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
17 Nov 200150.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Labicum
17 Nov 200150.4AppointedSecretary of the Fabric of St. Peter
6 Jan 200250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Labicum
22 Mar 202169.7ResignedSecretary of the Fabric of St. Peter

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Lanzani (VIAF: 49554353)
Bishop Vittorio Lanzani (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Fabric of St. Peter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarcignago, Diocese of Pavia, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Fabric of St. Peter.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,103
  • r: AM, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast