Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Crisostome Lan Shi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1925²Born
1954¹29.0Ordained PriestPriest
2000²75.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
28 Nov 200075.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
2010²85.0ResignedBishop of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China
21 Sep 201489.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Sanyuan [SanyŁan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Crisostome Lan Shi
Bishop John Crisostome Lan Shi (born 1925, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sanyuan [SanyŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongyuan, Gaoling County, Shaanxi
Death PlaceJingyang

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2015, Page 1,144
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,972
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,746
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast