Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Lagnese

Bishop of Caserta, Italy

Apostolic Administrator of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1961 Born
21 Sep 198524.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Capua, Italy
1 May 198624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Capua, Italy
23 Feb 201351.4AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
1 May 201351.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
11 May 201351.6InstalledBishop of Ischia, Italy
19 Dec 202059.2AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
19 Jan 202159.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ischia, Italy
20 Jan 202159.3InstalledBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Lagnese
Bishop Pietro Lagnese (born ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitulazio, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopIn Front of, Centro Parrocchiale Santa Maria dell`Agnena, Vitulazio, Archdiocese of Capua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caserta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 30 Mar 2013
  • c2+: CB, 1 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,781
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2020
  • loc: AM, 23 Dec 2020
  • i: CB, 31 Dec 2020
  • ab: CB, 19 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Jan 2021

Quantcast