Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Laera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta, Italy

Titular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1871Born
22 Sep 189423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
22 Dec 189423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
8 Jan 191038.6AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
Mar 1910³38.7ResignedBishop-Elect of Ogliastra, Italy
9 Jun 191039.0SelectedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
23 Jun 191039.0ConfirmedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
24 Jul 191039.1Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
24 Jul 193160.1ResignedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
24 Jul 193160.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Traianopolis in Phrygia
17 Jan 194270.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Laera
Bishop Agostino Laera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcquaviva delle Fonti, Territorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopCappella di Sant'Agnese, Almo collegio Capranica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCastellaneta, Diocese of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1910, Number 58
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,923
  • b/c1: AM, 23 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast