Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florian Kuntner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Hirina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1933Born
29 Jun 195724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 197744.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Sep 197744.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
20 Nov 197744.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
30 Mar 199461.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Florian Kuntner (VIAF: 267941041)
Bishop Florian Kuntner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKirchberg-Wechsel
Ordained BishopSankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,079

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast