Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kim Tchang-ryeol

Bishop Emeritus of Cheju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1927 Born
22 Aug 195326.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 198356.7AppointedBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
6 Jan 198456.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)
15 Jul 200275.4RetiredBishop of Cheju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Kim Tchang-ryeol
Bishop Paul Kim Tchang-ryeol (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cheju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYonan
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cheju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 27 Oct 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,862

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast