Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulinus Jeerakath, C.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1919Born
18 Feb 194626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
23 Mar 197253.0AppointedApostolic Exarch of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Feb 197757.9AppointedBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India
11 May 197758.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India
7 Aug 199071.3DiedBishop of Jagdalpur (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Paulinus Jeerakath
Bishop Paulinus Jeerakath C.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Jagdalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuruvinal
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Monastery, Mannanan

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,820
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast