Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Jara Franzoy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1929Born
4 Mar 196232.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
30 Apr 198252.7AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
6 Jun 198252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chillán, Chile
25 Mar 200676.6RetiredBishop of Chillán, Chile
5 Sep 201990.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Chillán, Chile

MicroData Summary for Alberto Jara Franzoy (VIAF: 28145856971622920814)
Bishop Alberto Jara Franzoy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained PriestSan Lazaro, Church, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopN.S. del Carmen, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Chillán, Diocese of San Bartolomé de Chillán

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • d: CB, 5 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast