Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ghebre Jesus Jacob

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea

Titular Bishop of Erythrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1889Born
30 Apr 191324.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 195161.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
24 Feb 195161.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
1 May 195162.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
Feb 1958³68.8ResignedApostolic Exarch of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea
22 Jan 196979.7DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Asmara (Ethiopian), Eritrea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ghebre Jesus Jacob (VIAF: 264159474190827661868)
Bishop Ghebre Jesus Jacob (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Asmara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHebo

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022