Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente José Carlos Isnard, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1917Born
11 Jul 193720.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Dec 194225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Apr 196042.7AppointedBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
25 Jul 196043.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
17 Jul 199275.0RetiredBishop of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Aug 201194.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Clemente José Carlos Isnard (VIAF: 6854780)
Bishop Clemente José Carlos Isnard O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nova Friburgo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 81
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • prof: CB, 3 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast