Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony John Ireland

Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia

Titular Bishop of Carinola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1957 Born
3 Aug 198629.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Melbourne, Australia
19 Sep 198730.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
14 May 202164.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Melbourne, Australia
14 May 202164.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carinola
31 Jul 202164.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carinola

MicroData Summary for Anthony John Ireland
Bishop Anthony John Ireland (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Melbourne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's, Cathedral, Melbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Melbourne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2021
  • ob: AM, 2 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast