Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Charles Bennet

Bishop of Sale, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1963 Born
22 Aug 199229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
27 Jun 202057.2AppointedBishop of Sale, Australia
8 Dec 202057.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sale, Australia

MicroData Summary for Gregory Charles Bennet
Bishop Gregory Charles Bennet (born ) Bishop of Sale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelbourne, Archdiocese of Melbourne
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Sale, Diocese of Sale

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2020
  • c1: CB, 27 Jun 2020
  • op: JI, 27 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 1 Aug 2020
  • ~ob: CB, 17 Sep 2020
  • ob: CB, 10 Nov 2020
  • c2: CB, 15 Nov 2020
  • c34: CB, 6 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast