Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephanus Han Jung Hyun

Auxiliary Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Mozotcori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1971 Born
21 Feb 200028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
28 Nov 202049.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}, Korea (South)
28 Nov 202049.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
25 Jan 202149.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori

MicroData Summary for Stephanus Han Jung Hyun
Bishop Stephanus Han Jung Hyun (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Daejeon {Taejon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Sung, Diocese of Daejeon {Taejon}
Ordained BishopSaint Andrew Kim Dae-geon Memorial, Shrine, Solmoe Holy Ground, Dangjin-si, Diocese of Daejeon {Taejon}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Daejeon {Taejon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 25 Jan 2021

Quantcast