Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Ángel de las Heras Berzal, C.M.F.

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1963 Born
26 Apr 198622.8Perpetual VowsMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
29 Oct 198825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Mar 201652.7AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
7 May 201652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
21 Oct 202057.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
19 Dec 202057.5InstalledBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Ángel de las Heras Berzal
Bishop Luis Ángel de las Heras Berzal C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegovia
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Mondoñedo, Diocese of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of León.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 16 Mar 2016
  • c1: CB, 17 Mar 2016
  • c2: CB, 30 Apr 2016
  • c3+: CB, 7 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,908
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast