Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Januarius Kyunosuke Hayasaka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nagasaki, Japan

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1883Born
10 Jun 191127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Hakodate, Japan
16 Jul 192743.8AppointedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
30 Oct 192744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
25 Apr 192844.6InstalledBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
5 Feb 193753.3ResignedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
5 Feb 193753.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
26 Oct 195976.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nagasaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Januarius Kyunosuke Hayasaka (VIAF: 3155707099722412687)
Bishop Januarius Kyunosuke Hayasaka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nagasaki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSendai, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Japan
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSpellman, Hospital, Sendai, Diocese of Sendai
Buried Place (Original) Akagi Bochi, Nagaskai-shi, Diocese of Nagasaki

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 66
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 333, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast