Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertalan Badalik, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1890Born
19 Jul 191423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Jun 194958.5AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
24 Aug 194958.7Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
11 Oct 196574.8DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Bertalan Badalik
Bishop Bertalan Badalik O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHódmezövásárhely
Ordained BishopRegina Rosarii, Church, Budapest

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast