Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Filipe Governo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quelimane, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1939Born
4 Oct 196930.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
31 May 197637.3AppointedBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
10 Oct 197637.7Ordained BishopBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
10 Mar 200768.1ResignedBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
20 Oct 201374.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Quelimane, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Filipe Governo
Bishop Bernardo Filipe Governo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quelimane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacuse
Ordained PriestTrento, Archdiocese of Trento, Italy
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Livramento, Quelimane, Diocese of Quelimane

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast