Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Gmür

Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1966 Born
30 May 199932.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
23 Nov 201044.4AppointedBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland
16 Jan 201144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Felix Gmür (VIAF: 8209425)
Bishop Felix Gmür (born ) Bishop of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucerne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Basel {Bâle, Basilea}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Feb 2021

Quantcast