Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maria Bonnemain, Opus Dei

Bishop of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1948 Born
15 Aug 197830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
15 Feb 202172.5AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
19 Mar 202172.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Bonnemain
Bishop Joseph Maria Bonnemain Opus Dei (born ) Bishop of Chur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Diocese of Barcelona, Spain
Ordained PriestShrine, Torreciudad, Diocese of Huesca, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chur, Diocese of Chur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2021
  • c1: CB, 17 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast